Glazman, Trevor Nolan (CPSO#: 67942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
314 Russell Hill Road
Toronto ON  M4V 2T8
Phone: (416) 696-9836
Fax: (416) 696-7881
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 27E
45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 696-9836
Fax: (416) 696-7881
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4646 Dufferin Street
Unit #9
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Canada
Phone: (416) 512-6407
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Unit 9
4646 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Canada
Phone: (416) 512-6407
Fax: (416) 512-6375
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trevor Glazman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Glazman ( CPSO# 67942 )

Business Address:
4646 Dufferin Street
Unit 9
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Phone Number: (416) 512-6407

Business Address:
314 Russell Hill Road
Toronto ON  M4V 2T8
Phone Number: (416) 483-6500

Business Address:
45 Overlea Boulevard
Unit 27E
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Phone Number: (416) 696-9836

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Orthopedics
Operating Room
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TREVOR NOLAN GLAZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLAZMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1996