Gledhill, Norman Scott (CPSO#: 67826)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medcan
Suite 1500
150 York St
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Gledhill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gledhill ( CPSO# 67826 )

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Suite 4N-459
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Business Address:
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (451) 635-0590

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORMAN SCOTT GLEDHILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLEDHILL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1996