Gleeson, Joseph Thomas (CPSO#: 77134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Mar 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 970
Gravenhurst ON  P1P 1V3
Phone: (705) 687-0558
Fax: (705) 687-5742
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Canada
Phone: (705) 645-4400
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

GreeneStone Muskoka Clinic
3571 Muskoka Road #169
P.O. Box 660
Bala ON  P0C 1A0
Canada
Phone: (705) 762-5501
Fax: (705) 762-6717
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph T. Gleeson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gleeson ( CPSO# 77134 )

Business Address:
105 Mckenzie Street
Gravenhurst ON  P1P 1A4
Phone Number: (705) 687-0558

Business Address:
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 645-4400

Business Address:
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Y8
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
3571 Muskoka Road 169
Bala ON  P0C 1A0
Phone Number: (705) 762-5501

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Dr. Gleeson has advised the College that patients may call his primary practice address at 705-687-0558 to obtain instructions regarding accessing copies of medical records. Patients may also send their requests via fax or email: Fax: 705-687-5742 Email: jgleeson5@cogeco.com
Date Received: 08 Jul 2011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 30 Mar 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 30 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from March 30, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Joseph Thomas
            Gleeson, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Gleeson to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. JOSEPH THOMAS GLEESON
                                          ("Dr. Gleeson")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Gleeson, certificate of registration number 77134, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge that an external review of my obstetrical
                  practice at Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare ("MAH") was conducted, resulting
                  in a report received by the College on October 3, 2013.  The external
                  review identified concerns about my obstetrical practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge that I voluntarily relinquished my
                  obstetrical privileges at MAH in February 2013, and have not practised
                  obstetrics since that time. I confirm I have no obstetrical privileges at
                  any other hospital.

            (5)   I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7213622 (the "Investigation") into my standard of
                  practice. This investigation resulted in a report dated October 6, 2016.
                  The Independent Assessor identified concerns about my obstetrical
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (6)   I, Dr. Gleeson, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (7)   Residency Program

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gleeson, undertake to successfully complete a three month
                        residency program in Advanced Skills Low Risk Obstetrics at a
                        location suitable to the College as  set out in the Individualized
                        Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "A". 
                  
            (8)   Practice Restriction

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gleeson, agree that prior to the completion of the Advanced
                        Skills                                                       Low
                        Risk Obstetrics Residency Program, I shall not return to
                        independent obstetrical practice in any jurisdiction.  For great
                        certainty, this restriction shall not prevent or preclude me from
                        completing the Residency Program described in (7) above.
                  
            (9)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gleeson, upon successful completion of the Advanced Skills
                        Low Risk Obstetrics Residency Program, undertake to practise under
                        the guidance of a clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College
                        (the "Clinical Supervisor(s)"), for nine (9) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "B", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the IEP attached
                              as Appendix "A";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting or in the event that I have seen less than twenty
                              patients in that month, review all of my obstetrical charts;
                  
                        (iv)  Directly observe a minimum of ten (10) deliveries and comment
                              on these;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three (3) months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the
                        external review and the report of the medical inspector dated
                        October 6, 2016, and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Gleeson, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" and "B" to this Undertaking, and to
                        abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s),
                        including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements
                        and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Gleeson, undertake to ensure that Appendix "B" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I commence obstetrical practice. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Gleeson, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "B" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Gleeson, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (9)(f) and/or
                        (g) above, I will cease practising obstetrics until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practicing obstetrics as a result of section (9)(g) above this will
                        constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                        registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the public register.
                  
            (10)  Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gleeson, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"): 
                        (i)   Complete the : "Alarrn" and "MOREOB" Courses, if available,
                              or if not, alternate courses acceptable to the College; and
                  
                        (ii)  review and complete a written summary of CPSO Policy on
                              "Consent to Treatment" and CMA "Code of Ethics".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gleeson, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (11)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gleeson, undertake that, approximately twelve (12) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (9) above and Appendix  "A" and "B" to this Undertaking, I will
                        submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gleeson, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of
                        the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Gleeson, undertake that, following the decision referenced
                        in section (11)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of
                        the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Gleeson, hereby consent to any of the following being
                        included on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations
                        on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23
                        of the Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice; and
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (11)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (12)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gleeson, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gleeson, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gleeson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP,  and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP form(s),
                        attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (16)  I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (17)  I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (18)  I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (19)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gleeson, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (19)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Gleeson's
                              obstetrical practice.  As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Gleeson will complete a three (3) month residency
                                    in obstetrics. 
                              *     Dr. Gleeson has agreed not to return to independent
                                    obstetrical practice in any jurisdiction until he has
                                    completed the residency program.
                              *     Further to the completion of the residency program, Dr.
                                    Gleeson will practice under the guidance of a Clinical
                                    Supervisor acceptable to the College for nine (9)
                                    months. 
                              *     Dr. Gleeson's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within twelve (12)
                                    months of the end of the period of Clinical
                                    Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (20)  I, Dr. Gleeson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (21)  I, Dr. Gleeson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Gleeson, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the IEP at Appendix "A" and the
                        Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "B" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 30, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Joseph Thomas Gleeson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 30, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Gleeson’s obstetrical practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Gleeson will complete a three (3) month residency in obstetrics.

Dr. Gleeson has agreed not to return to independent obstetrical practice in any jurisdiction until he has completed the residency program.

Further to the completion of the residency program, Dr. Gleeson will practice under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for nine (9) months.

Dr. Gleeson’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within twelve (12) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.