Gleeson, Thomas Richard James (CPSO#: 20893)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Apr 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Gleeson Tel:(905) 527-5377 Fax: (905)527-6485
Instructions: Patients should indicate their names and date of birth
Date Received: 23 Apr 2010

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2008
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 14 May 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Apr 2014
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 15 Apr 2014

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 23 May 2013
Summary:

 On May 23, 2013, the Fitness to Practise Committee found that Dr. Thomas R. J. Gleeson is 
 incapacitated, as defined in s.1(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code.

On October 10, 
 2013, the Fitness to Practise Committee ordered and directed that the Registrar impose the 
 following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Gleeson's certificate of registration:

1.	Dr. 
 Gleeson shall not practise medicine until he:

(a)	undergoes an assessment by the Ontario Medical 
 Association's Physician Health Program ("PHP");
(b)	based on this assessment, enters into a 
 monitoring agreement with the PHP; and
(c)	provides a copy of the monitoring agreement to the 
 College.

2.	That the decision and reasons of the Fitness to Practise Committee in respect of its 
 finding of incapacity and disposition, together with the exhibits filed with the Committee, 
 excluding Tab 37 of Exhibit 4, be provided to the PHP, for the purpose of the assessment. 

3.	Dr. 
 Gleeson must comply fully with the terms and requirements of the PHP's monitoring agreement.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): March 11-15 (March 13 1:00 p.m. start), 2013


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Sep 2008
Summary:

 On Monday, the 15th day of September, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Gleeson to have 
 committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice 
 of the profession. 

1.	The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to impose the following 
 terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Gleeson(s certificate of registration: 

(a) 	At his own 
 expense, Dr. Gleeson shall undergo the Physician Review and Enhancement Program ((PREPTM() and 
 shall abide by any and all reasonable recommendations made as a result of PREPTM.  Dr. Gleeson 
 shall enrol in the PREPTM course within 5 weeks of the date of this Order;

(b)	At his own 
 expense, Dr. Gleeson shall successfully complete the College(s Medical RecordKeeping for 
 Physicians course and follow up component by July 1, 2009 and shall provide proof of same to the 
 College upon completion; and

(c)  	At his own expense, Dr. Gleeson shall undergo a monthly 
 clinical monitoring of a minimum of 10 charts per month for a period of 2 years by a monitor who 
 is a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario and who is approved by the 
 College (the (Monitor().  The Monitor shall report to the College quarterly.  If the Monitor is 
 concerned that Dr. Gleeson(s practice falls below the standard of practice of the profession 
 and/or that Dr. Gleeson(s patients may be exposed to risk of harm or injury, the Monitor shall 
 immediately inform the College.  The monitoring period shall commence no later than 45 days from 
 the date of this Order.

2.	The Discipline Committee Orders that Dr. Gleeson pay costs to the 
 College in the amount of $5,000.00 payable within 180 days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 15, 2008

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 3, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Thomas Richard James Gleeson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):

I, Dr. Thomas Richard James Gleeson:

(4) Acknowledge that I was the subject of an investigation (the “Investigation”) by the College arising from a letter of complaint received on November 1, 2013. There has been no referral of the matter to the Discipline Committee. I acknowledge and agree that, in exchange for an original copy of this Undertaking executed by me, the College will not proceed with the Investigation into my practice.

(5) Hereby resign from the College effective immediately (the “Effective Date”).

(6) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.

(7) Agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I am in breach of this Undertaking including, but not limited to, becoming aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration, or equivalent, to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the specified allegations set out in the Notice of Hearing,

(11) Acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(12) Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.