Glenns, Vivian Pamela (CPSO#: 66749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 334
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 498-4888
Fax: (416) 498-6770
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vivian Glenns Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Glenns ( CPSO# 66749 )

Business Address:
Suite 334
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 498-4888

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIAN PAMELA GLENNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLENNS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1997