Glick, Daniel (CPSO#: 16363)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. D. Glick c/o Dr. Goldman and Dr. Chang 1490 Danforth Avenue Toronto, Ontario M4J 1N4 Tel: 416-463-4878
Date Received: 05 Nov 2008

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2005

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Jun 1993
Summary:

 In June 1993, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Glick guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he charged a fee that was in excess of 
 the fee in the schedule of fees of the Ontario Medical Association without prior notification to 
 the patient as to the excess amount of the fee, contrary to s. 27(8); in that he charged a fee 
 that was excessive in relation to the services performed, contrary to s. 27(9); in that he failed 
 to carry out the terms of an agreement with a patient, contrary to s. 27(10); in that he failed to 
 maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); in that he failed to 
 continue to provide professional services to a patient until the services were no longer required 
 or until the patient had had a reasonable opportunity to arrange for the services of another 
 member, contrary to s. 27(23); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).  Consequently, the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Glick be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded, 
 and ruled that the Doctor pay a fine of $5000.00.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 14 Jun 1993