Glicksman, Howard Melvyn (CPSO#: 30890)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010