Gliklich, Ian (CPSO#: 66616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1152 Morningside Avenue
Unit 1A
Scarborough ON  M1B 3A4
Phone: (416) 284-2853
Fax: (416) 284-4951
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Gliklich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Gliklich ( CPSO# 66616 )

Business Address:
Unit 1A
1152 Morningside Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 3A4
Phone Number: (416) 284-2853

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN GLIKLICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLIKLICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1995