Gloor, Jane Elizabeth (CPSO#: 60094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone: (519) 641-8687
Fax: (519) 641-6518
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jane E. Gloor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gloor ( CPSO# 60094 )

Business Address:
206 - 460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone Number: (519) 641-8687

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE ELIZABETH GLOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLOOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988