Glowacki, Adam Ryszard (CPSO#: 53931)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2224 Walker Road
Suite 131
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 971-7733
Fax: (519) 971-0854
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Site
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Glowacki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Glowacki ( CPSO# 53931 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
131 - 2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 971-7733

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 18 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM RYSZARD GLOWACKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLOWACKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1989