Glowacki, Lori Shannon (CPSO#: 52736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 835
4708 Alliance Road
Plano TX  75093
United States
Phone: (214) 358-2300 Ext. 7600
Fax: (972) 599-2090

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 09 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORI SHANNON GLOWACKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLOWACKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1985