Glowczewski-Park, Elizabeth Yoo-Hee (CPSO#: 82480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: Park, Yoo Hee Elizabeth (used until: 19 Dec 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East GTA Family Health Team
6th Floor
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 751-5600
Fax: (416) 751-3600
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Glowczewski-Park Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Glowczewski-Park ( CPSO# 82480 )

Business Address:
East GTA Family Health Team
6th Floor
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 751-5600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Jul 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH YOO-HEE GLOWCZEWSKI-PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLOWCZEWSKI-PARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 28 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008