Gmora, Shawn Warren (CPSO#: 65600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre Francophone de Toronto
Suite 280
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 492-2672
Fax: (416) 492-3157
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWN WARREN GMORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GMORA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993