Gnam, William Henry (CPSO#: 60016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TS Medical Centre
692 Euclid Avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 2T9
Phone: (416) 901-9020 Ext. 2325
Fax: (416) 901-7217
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gnam and Paek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Paek ( CPSO# 58104 )
Dr. W. Gnam ( CPSO# 60016 )

Business Address:
TS Medical Centre
692 Euclid Avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 2T9
Phone Number: (416) 901-9020

Business Address:
Suite 8711
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM HENRY GNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GNAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1989