Gnanendran, Kandiah Padigalingam (CPSO#: 69556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese, Tamil

Education:University of Colombo, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesiology
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gnanendran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gnanendran ( CPSO# 69556 )

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesiology
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KANDIAH PADIGALINGAM GNANENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GNANENDRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1997