Gnidec, Anatoly Allan Franklin (CPSO#: 50750)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Mar 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 1987

Summary

Former Name: Gnidec, Anatoly Allan (used until: 25 Jan 1987 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14650 Heart Lake Rd
Caledon ON  L7C 2J7
Phone: (416) 356-2782
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANATOLY ALLAN FRANKLIN GNIDEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GNIDEC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1987