Gob, Alan (CPSO#: 86822)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C University Hospital
Division of Haematology
Room B9-100
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196633151
Fax: 5196633062
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan Gob Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gob ( CPSO# 86822 )

Business Address:
LHSC
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
B9-100
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN GOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011