Gocker, Marianne (CPSO#: 56523)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Georgetown University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their record can send an email to: mgocker22@gmail.com, or call 585 773 4021.
Date Received: 26 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2017