Goddard Hill, Alban Claude (CPSO#: 31429)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alban C. Goddard Hill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 22 2016

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Requests may be sent by email to albancgh@gmail.com
Date Received: 29 Sep 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2016