Godfrey, Sean Edmund (CPSO#: 65777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1058
200 Taunton Road West
Whitby ON  L1R 3H8
Phone: (905) 444-9636
Fax: (905) 444-9853
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean E. Godfrey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Godfrey ( CPSO# 65777 )
Dr. S. Campbell ( CPSO# 68101 )

Business Address:
Unit 1058
200 Taunton Road West
Whitby ON  L1R 3H8
Phone Number: (905) 444-9636

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN EDMUND GODFREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GODFREY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1996