Godlewski, Ewa Jozefa (CPSO#: 73163)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001