Godsoe, Suzanne Kathleen (CPSO#: 87880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 5602
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Henry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Godsoe ( CPSO# 87880 )
Dr. E. Henry ( CPSO# 89720 )

Business Address:
215 - 1385 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone Number: (613) 562-9000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE KATHLEEN GODSOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GODSOE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2007 to 18 Dec 2007
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2008 to 16 Dec 2008
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009