Goebel, Cindy Rose (CPSO#: 68911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
323 Wilson Street East
Suite 205
Ancaster ON  L9G 4A8
Phone: (905) 648-8786
Fax: (905) 648-7730
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CINDY ROSE GOEBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOEBEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Mar 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1997