Goede, Laura Anna (CPSO#: 58836)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1989
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jan 2006