Goel, Reena (CPSO#: 65326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McLauglin Village Medical Clinic
85 Steeles Avenue West
Brampton ON  L6Y 0K3
Phone: (905) 455-9374
Fax: (905) 455-9505
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REENA GOEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993