Goel, Sunita (CPSO#: 62559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: Bhargava, Sunita (used until: 07 Jan 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
4170 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7L 0G7
Phone: (905) 333-9799
Fax: (905) 333-4799
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sunita Goel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Goel ( CPSO# 62559 )

Business Address:
Suite 4
4170 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7L 0G7
Phone Number: (905) 333-9799

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNITA GOEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1991