Goertzen, James Henry (CPSO#: 61989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Mar 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Lakehead University
ATAC Room 6023
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 766-7448
Fax: (807) 766-7343
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Fort William Family Health Team
1260 Golf Links Road
Suite 201
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Canada
Phone: 807 626-1218
Fax: 807 623-8832
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Goertzen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Goertzen ( CPSO# 61989 )

Business Address:
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Lakehead University
ATAC Room 6023
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone Number: (807) 766-7448

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES HENRY GOERTZEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOERTZEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1998