Goettel, Nicolai Sebastian (CPSO#: 96424)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Rhenish Frederick William Univ of Bonn, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 12 Aug 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2013