Goetz, Catherine Jean (CPSO#: 57054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: Osberg, Catherine Jean (used until: 01 Mar 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Healthcare
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 2290
Fax: (613) 968-9912
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goetz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Goetz ( CPSO# 57054 )

Business Address:
Quinte Healthcare Corporation
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE JEAN GOETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOETZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1988