Gofeld, Michael (CPSO#: 82088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Oct 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:National Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
76 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone: (416) 3236400 Ext. 5981
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8054 Yonge St suite #100
Thornhill ON  L4J 1W3
Canada
Phone: 905-886-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

4646 Dufferin St., Unit #9
North York ON  M3H 5S4
Canada
Phone: 416-512-6407
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Gofeld Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gofeld ( CPSO# 82088 )

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6269

Business Address:
4646 Dufferin Street
North York ON  M3H 5S4
Phone Number: (416) 512-6407

Business Address:
100-8054 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1W3
Phone Number: (905) 886-1212

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 10 Nov 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Pain Medicine Effective: 10 Nov 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 10 Feb 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Oct 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Oct 2020
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Nov 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Michael Gofeld may practise medicine independently in anaesthesia and pain
            medicine.