Goffi, Alberto (CPSO#: 93101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 2015

Expiry Date:  20 Apr 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 May 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Turin, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
2nd Floor - Mclaughlin Wing
Room 411-H
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 2074
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 29 May 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 May 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 May 2015
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 May 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Apr 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 04 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Alberto Goffi may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Critical Care, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Goffi holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Goffi  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Goffi's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Goffi's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on May 29, 2015, and currently has an interim
                  expiry date of April 20, 2019.  The expiry date of this certificate may
                  be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.