Goffin, John Robert (CPSO#: 69872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 64603
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goffin Rudkowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rudkowski ( CPSO# 86067 )
Dr. J. Goffin ( CPSO# 69872 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Suite 3-15
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
Dept of General Internal Medicine
Suite F507
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT GOFFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOFFIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2005