Gofman, Frina (CPSO#: 51649)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Nov 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Leningrad Paediatric Medical Institute, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Iron Mountain Records Management 20 Atlantic Avenue Toronto, ON M6K 1X8 Tel: 416 516 4075
Date Received: 10 Nov 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Nov 2014