Gogan, Nessa Roisin (CPSO#: 65699)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 18 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Dec 1997