Goh, Pak Liang (CPSO#: 82265)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Singapore, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2005 to 13 May 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 May 2005 to 30 Mar 2006
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2006