Goh, Raymond Hsien Tze (CPSO#: 62193)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Diagnostic Imaging
Rouge Valley Health System
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 4135
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raymond Goh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goh ( CPSO# 62193 )

Business Address:
Diagnostic Imaging
Rouge Valley Health System
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND HSIEN TZE GOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1991