Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Goheen, Mary Susan Lynn Beamish (CPSO#: 65772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4940
Fax: (613) 761-5032
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goheen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Goheen ( CPSO# 65772 )

Business Address:
GI Clinic
207-1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 729-3179

Business Address:
Surgicentre East
750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orleans ON  K1C 1T1
Phone Number: (613) 837-4207

Business Address:
TOH General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite B306
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4576

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Site
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY SUSAN LYNN BEAMISH GOHEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOHEEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1992