Gokhale, Anandita Vijay (CPSO#: 103700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: Gokhale, Anandita (used until: 21 Dec 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Parkside Drive, Box 370
St Jacobs ON  N0B 2N0
Phone: 519-664-3794
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2958 Greenfield Rd. PO Box 1143
Ayr ON  N0B 1E0
Canada
Phone: 519-632-1229
Fax: 519-632-1253
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anandita V. Gokhale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gokhale ( CPSO# 103700)

Business Address:
10 Parkside Drive
Box 370
St Jacobs ON  N0B 2N0
Phone Number: (519) 664-3794

Business Address:
2958 Greenfield Road
Ayr ON  N0B 1E0
Phone Number: (519) 632-1229

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANANDITA VIJAY GOKHALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOKHALE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016