Gokhale, Sandhya Vijay (CPSO#: 83896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 302
310 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 2L3
Phone: (519) 743-2142
Fax: (519) 743-2405
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandhya Gokhale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gokhale ( CPSO# 83896 )

Business Address:
Unit 302
310 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 743-2142

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jan 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDHYA VIJAY GOKHALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOKHALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 27 Mar 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 28 Mar 2006 to 15 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 16 Jan 2007 to 15 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2008