Golan, Eyal (CPSO#: 84989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Toronto ON  L4C4Z3
Phone: (647) 401-4936
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eyal Golan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Golan ( CPSO# 84989 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
102 - 200 Ronson Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 5Z9

Business Address:
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EYAL GOLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2007