Golan, Haim (CPSO#: 67693)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Mar 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1996