Golbabaei, Mehdi (CPSO#: 111198)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Dec 2016 to 15 Jan 2017
Elective Trainee - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Jan 2017 to 26 Mar 2017
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jul 2017
Elective Trainee - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2017