Gold, Allan Curtis (CPSO#: 23046)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Dec 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Mar 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Dec 1994

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Nov 1994
Summary:

 In May 1994, Dr. Gold was the subject of a disciplinary hearing before the Discipline Committee of 
 the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario wherein it was alleged that he was guilty of 
 professional misconduct and incompetence in that he engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient, 
 failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, engaged in conduct or an act 
 relevant to the practice of medicine which would be reasonably regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unfprofessional and displayed in his professional care a lack of knowlege, skill 
 or judgement or disregard for the welfare of a patient of a nature or to an extent that 
 demonstrated that he is unfit to practice, all the foregoing being contrary to the Health 
 Disciplines Act.

These allegations arose from the complaints of a number of patients.  Dr. Gold  
 pleaded (not guilty( to these charges and a hearing into them commenced.  Later in the hearing, 
 Dr. Gold entered into an agreement which provided that the hearing would be indefinitely adjourned 
 on condition that Dr. Gold resign his membership in the College effective immediately and that he 
 agree to execute an undertaking to the College not to reapply for a Certificate of Registration to 
 practice medicine and other terms.  He further agreed that the provisions of this agreement be 
 included in the Register.  Dr. Gold having carried out the terms of the agreement, the hearing was 
 adjourned indefinitely.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 03, 1994