Gold, Ileana-Maria (CPSO#: 70875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58439
Fax: (905) 494-6569
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ileana-Maria Gold Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Gold ( CPSO# 70875 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 25 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILEANA-MARIA GOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Oct 1996 to 29 Jan 1997
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 03 Mar 1997 to 31 Mar 1997
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jan 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997