Gold, Jewel (CPSO#: 53383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 1604
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5275
Fax: (416) 586-5980
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Medical Associates
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 500
Toronto ON  M5M 1C5
Canada
Phone: (416) 781-9500
Fax: (416) 781-7985
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jewel Gold Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gold ( CPSO# 53383 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 1604
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5275

Business Address:
500 - 491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 781-9500

Business Address:
Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEWEL GOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1983