Golda, Nicole (CPSO#: 88504)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
GSE 140
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6577
Fax: 416-756-6567
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole Golda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Golda ( CPSO# 88504 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
6SE 140
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE GOLDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014