Goldberg, Benjamin (CPSO#: 17635)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education:Dalhousie University, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical record locations from: 1) 1960 to 1985: Child and Parent Resource Institute 600 Sanatorium Road London, ON N6H 3W7 Tel: (519) 858-2774 2) 1985 to 2009 : Command Records Management 100 Picadilly Street London, ON N6A 1R8 Tel: (519) 672-1460 3) 2009 to 2013: Central West Specialized Developmental Services 51 Bond Street Oakville, ON 6K 1L8 (905) 844-7864 OR Regional Support Associates 333 Athlone Avenue Woodstock, ON N4V 0B8 Tel: (519) 421-4219
Date Received: 20 Jun 2013


Address: Patients seeking medical records from Dr.’s private practice (closed on Jan 30/09) can locate them at: Command Services 100 Piccadilly Street London, Ontario N6A 1R8 Tel: 519-672-1460 Additionally, from Jan 30/09 to May 31/13 medical records may be obtained from: Regional Support Associates 333 Athlone Avenue Woodstock, ON N4V 0B8 Tel: 519-421-4248
Date Received: 24 Jan 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013