Goldberg, Cindy Lara (CPSO#: 84054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Nov 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7131 Bathurst Street
Suite 206
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Z1
Phone: (905) 731-7596
Fax: (905) 731-4975
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Nov 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 May 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Dec 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Cindy Lara Goldberg may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.