Goldberg, Franklin (CPSO#: 50752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5692
Fax: (416) 864-5380
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Franklin Goldberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060


Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. G. Mnatzakanian ( CPSO# 88831 )
Dr. J. Barfett ( CPSO# 84352 )
Dr. A. Zalev ( CPSO# 24495 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 11 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANKLIN GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1984