Goldberg Jacob, Nesya Freyda Frances (CPSO#: 80329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone: (905) 881-6667
Fax: (905) 731-1298
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NESYA FREYDA FRANCES GOLDBERG JACOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG JACOB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2007